WV HB2008 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 86, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 86, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for a performance and efficiency audit of the Division of Highways.
Title
Auditing the Division of Highways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 32) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 42) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 41) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 32) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 42) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 41) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 86, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | Approved by Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-25 | House | Approved by Governor 2/25/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-26 | Senate | To Governor 2/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/25/15 |
2015-02-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 32) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-06 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 42) |
2015-02-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 41) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-06 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-02-06 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Daily Calender |
2015-02-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2015-02-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-04 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2015-02-03 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-01-19 | House | To House Finance |
2015-01-19 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-01-14 | House | To House Government Organization |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-14 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB8 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - To House Finance