WV HB2004 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit a licensed health care professional from another to state to practice in this state through telehealth when registered with the appropriate West Virginia board.
Title
Permit a licensed health care professional from another state to practice in this state through telehealth when registered with the appropriate West Virginia board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |