WV HB116 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require notices be given to relevant courts and judicial authorities when a person originally under the custody of the Bureau for Juvenile Services, but charged under the adult jurisdiction of the courts, attains the age of 18 and to provide for designated units to house such offenders out of sight and sound of juvenile detainees and adult inmates.
Title
Relating generally to persons eighteen years of age and older in the custody of the Bureau of Juvenile Services
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 816) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 815) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 48) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 48) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 47) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 773) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 772) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 771) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 815) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 48) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 48) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 47) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 773) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 772) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 771) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - House Journal |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-29 | House | Approved by Governor 5/29/19 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/24/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | To Governor 5/24/19 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-05-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 816) |
2019-05-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 815) |
2019-05-20 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 48) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 48) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 47) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 773) |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 772) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 771) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-05-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-05-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1007 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - To Rules
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 4 | 722 | Amended Code | Citation Text |