WI SJR59 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-01 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-01 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: congratulating the United States Navy on the commissioning of the USS Milwaukee.
Title
Congratulating the United States Navy on the commissioning of the USS Milwaukee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-01 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-11-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-16 | House | Representatives Shankland, Bowen, Loudenbeck and Hesselbein added as cosponsors |
2015-11-16 | House | Concurred in |
2015-11-12 | House | Withdrawn from Committee on Rules and referred to calendar of 11-16-2015 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2015-11-05 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Senator Lazich added as a coauthor |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Introduced |