WI SJR43 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing June 9 to 15, 2019, as Army Week in Wisconsin.
Title
Recognizing June 9 to 15, 2019, as Army Week in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Concurred in |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-11 | House | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-10 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senator Johnson added as a coauthor |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senator Petrowski added as a coauthor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Representative Horlacher added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced |