WI SJR34 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commemorating the 50th anniversary of Summerfest.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of Summerfest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-14 | House | Concurred in |
2017-06-07 | House | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-02 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced |