WI SB900 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 30.122; to amend 30.122 (title); and to create 30.01 (1h), 30.122 (2), 30.122 (3), 30.2039 and 885.335 of the statutes; Relating to: use of fill in commercial waterways and establishing shorelines of Great Lakes waters. (FE)
Title
Use of fill in commercial waterways and establishing shorelines of Great Lakes waters. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:55 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Stroebel and Cowles |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |