WI SB90 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 350.12 (3) (b) of the statutes; relating to: the registration of antique snowmobiles.
Title
The registration of antique snowmobiles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-05-21 | Public hearing held | |
2009-04-07 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb90 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB90.pdf |