WI SB865 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 182.01 (7) and 710.18 of the statutes; Relating to: regulating homeowners' associations and requiring the Department of Financial Institutions to create a filing system for notices filed by homeowners' associations. (FE)
Title
Regulating homeowners' associations and requiring the Department of Financial Institutions to create a filing system for notices filed by homeowners' associations. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] |
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Published 3-19-2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-18-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 199 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:07 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senator Stafsholt added as a coauthor |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Housing, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senator Bernier added as a coauthor |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Commerce and Trade |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced |