WI SB703 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 15.197 (22m) and 146.695 of the statutes; Relating to: establishing a Palliative Care Council. (FE)
Title
Establishing a Palliative Care Council. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Representative Conley added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representative Rozar added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-22 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Introduced |