WI SB698 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 15.07 (3) (bm) 3., 15.07 (3) (bm) 6., 15.08 (3) (c), 15.085 (3) (b), 15.405 (1m), 15.405 (10r) (c), 15.407 (18) (c), 66.1019 (3), 101.02 (7m), 101.02 (12), 101.02 (20), 101.02 (21), 101.02 (24), 101.12 (6) (a), 101.125 (2), (3) (b) and (c) and (4m), 101.14 (4m) (a) 3., 101.16 (3g) (b), 101.19 (1r), 101.596 (1) (a), 101.596 (2) (c), 101.596 (3), 101.957, subchapter VI (title) of chapter 101 [precedes 101.971], 101.971 (intro.), (1), (3) and (4), 101.973, 101.974 (intro.), (1), (3) and (5), 101.974 (2), 101.975, 101.976, 101.977 and 101.978, 101.985 (4), chapter 145 (title), 145.035, 145.045 (2), 145.13, 440.03 (16), 440.04 (9), 440.11 (3), 445.08 (4), 457.09 (3) (b) and 457.16 (3); to renumber 145.04, 145.045 (title) and (1), 145.05, 145.06, 145.14, 145.16, 145.17, 145.175, 145.18, 145.19, 145.195 and 145.23; to renumber and amend 15.085 (3) (a), 15.09 (3), 101.02 (1), 101.12 (6) (b), 101.16 (3g) (a), 101.971 (2), 101.974 (4), 145.01, 145.02, 145.045 (3), 145.07, 145.08, 145.09, 145.10, 145.11, 145.12, 145.15, 145.165, 145.20, 145.24, 145.245, 145.26, 440.20 (4), 440.20 (5) and 445.08 (1); to consolidate, renumber and amend 101.125 (3) (intro.) and (a); to amend 15.07 (3) (b), 15.08 (3) (a), 15.085 (5) (b) 1., 15.405 (2) (a), 15.405 (2m) (b), 15.405 (10r) (b), 15.406 (6) (a) 2., 15.407 (10) (b), 15.407 (13) (b), 15.407 (14) (b), 20.165 (2) (a), 20.165 (2) (j), 20.165 (2) (ke), 20.165 (2) (ma), 20.320 (3) (q), 25.46 (5c), 43.09 (1), 45.44 (1) (a) 6., 45.44 (1) (a) 16., 49.857 (1) (b), 49.857 (1) (d) 7., 59.70 (5) (a), 59.70 (5) (b), 60.70 (5), 60.77 (5) (bm), 60.77 (5) (j), 67.12 (12) (a), 73.0301 (1) (d) 5., 100.21 (1) (a), 101.02 (7r) (a), 101.02 (7r) (b) 4., 101.02 (13) (a), 101.10 (4) (a), 101.10 (4) (b), 101.10 (4) (c), 101.12 (1) (a), 101.121 (3) (a), 101.121 (3) (b), 101.125 (4) (a), 101.125 (5), 101.14 (4) (g) 1., 101.14 (4m) (a) 1., 101.1472 (2), 101.17, 101.596 (2) (a) and (b), 101.63 (1) (intro.), 101.63 (2), 101.642 (2), 101.648 (1) (b), 101.653 (5) (b) 2., 101.654 (1) (c) 1., 101.66 (3), 101.73 (2), 101.77, 101.84 (1), 101.862 (4) (p), 101.88 (3), 101.94 (8) (a), 101.951 (7) (a), 101.951 (7) (b), 101.952 (5), 101.965 (1p), 101.985 (5) (a), 101.988 (3), 108.227 (1) (e) 5., 115.33 (1) (a), 118.135 (2), 160.255 (1), 200.21 (11), 200.29 (1) (c) 3. a., 234.49 (1) (e), 254.176 (2) (d), 281.17 (3), 281.344 (8) (b) 3., 281.346 (8) (b) 3., 281.48 (2) (bm), 281.48 (5) (a) 4., 281.48 (5m) (c), 281.59 (1m) (c), 281.75 (18), 321.60 (1) (a) 7., 321.60 (1) (a) 18., 343.305 (6) (bm), 440.03 (3m), 440.03 (7), 440.03 (7m), 440.03 (11m) (a) (intro.), 440.03 (13) (a), 440.03 (13) (am), 440.08 (2) (a) 59., 440.19, 440.205, 440.22 (1), 440.22 (2), 440.92 (9) (b) 3., 443.07 (4), 445.04 (3) (a), 445.04 (3) (b) (intro.), 445.045 (1) (g), 446.02 (7) (d) 1., 446.02 (7) (d) 2., 448.02 (8) (a), 448.07 (1) (a), 448.13 (1) (a) (intro.), 448.13 (2), 448.13 (3), 457.09 (3) (a), 470.05 and 632.10 (1); to repeal and recreate 101.596 (title), 101.63 (1) (intro.), 448.02 (8) (a) and 448.07 (1) (a); and to create 15.07 (3) (c), 15.09 (3) (b), 101.02 (1) (a), 101.02 (1) (c), 101.02 (7r) (g), 101.022, 101.125 (2m), 101.148 (3), 101.94 (5), subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 101 [precedes 101.9911], 440.20 (4) (b), 440.20 (5) (b) and 445.04 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: duties and powers of the Department of Safety and Professional Services concerning certain credentialing and occupational licensing functions; mandatory meeting requirements for various boards and councils; membership and rules procedures of certain boards; discipline and examination and other licensure requirements for certain professionals; plumbing and fire protection systems and swimming pool plan review; requiring the exercise of rule-making authority; making appropriations; and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Duties and powers of the Department of Safety and Professional Services concerning certain credentialing and occupational licensing functions; mandatory meeting requirements for various boards and councils; membership and rules procedures of certain boards; discipline and examination and other licensure requirements for certain professionals; plumbing and fire protection systems and swimming pool plan review; requiring the exercise of rule-making authority; making appropriations; and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-25 | House | Housing report received pursuant to s. 13.099 (2) Wisconsin Statutes |
2016-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2016-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes2 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |