WI SB639 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 343.085 (2) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: exemptions from the requirement that an original driver's license be a probationary license. (FE)
Title
Exemptions from the requirement that an original driver's license be a probationary license. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Introduced |