WI SB62 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: merit pay raises for state public defenders.
Title
Merit pay raises for state public defenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Representative Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-2-2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 7 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Representative S. Rodriguez added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-24-2021 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-02-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2021-02-16 | House | Read |
2021-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senator Smith added as a coauthor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |