WI SB59 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.11 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: University of Wisconsin System reports regarding remedial courses in English and mathematics.
Title
University of Wisconsin System reports regarding remedial courses in English and mathematics.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
Sen. John Jagler [R] | Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Dean Knudson [R] |
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] |
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] | Rep. Travis Tranel [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] |
Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education Reform and Government Operations |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb59 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB59.pdf |