WI SB572 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.1110 (4) (c); to amend 66.1109 (2) (c), 66.1109 (2m) (c), 66.1109 (4m) (c), 66.1110 (3) (c), 66.1110 (3) (e), 66.1110 (4m) (c), 66.1110 (5) and 66.1110 (6) (b) 3.; and to create 66.1109 (1) (ce), 66.1109 (3) (e), 66.1109 (6), 66.1110 (4) (c) 1., 66.1110 (4) (c) 2., 66.1110 (4) (cg), 66.1110 (4) (cr) and 66.1110 (4) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: multijurisdictional business improvement districts, annual reports for neighborhood improvement districts, and certain notifications for neighborhood improvement districts and business improvement districts. (FE)
Title
Multijurisdictional business improvement districts, annual reports for neighborhood improvement districts, and certain notifications for neighborhood improvement districts and business improvement districts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-11-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2023-10-23 | Senate | Introduced |