WI SB495 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 84.30 (5) (br) of the statutes; Relating to: the removal of nonconforming outdoor advertising signs along highways. (FE)
Title
The removal of nonconforming outdoor advertising signs along highways. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2017-12-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Representative VanderMeer added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb495 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB495.pdf |