WI SB475 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-27 - Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-27 - Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 632.85 (title) and 632.85 (3); and to create 632.85 (1) (d) and 632.851 of the statutes; Relating to: prior authorization for coverage of physical therapy, occupational therapy, speech therapy, chiropractic services, and other services under health plans.
Title
Prior authorization for coverage of physical therapy, occupational therapy, speech therapy, chiropractic services, and other services under health plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-27 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-13 | Senate | Representative Melotik added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Small Business |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Introduced |