WI SB469 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 440.09 (2); to renumber and amend 440.09 (2m), 440.09 (3) (a), 440.09 (3) (b), 440.09 (4) and 440.09 (5); to amend 101.022, 101.874 (2), 101.874 (3) (intro.) and 440.09 (title); and to create 89.072 (3), 101.874 (4), 440.09 (1) (title), 440.09 (1m), 440.09 (2e) (title) and 440.09 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: reciprocal credentials and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Reciprocal credentials and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Licensing and Forestry |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Introduced |