WI SB458 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 16.971 (10m) and 971.23 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: index of discovery for district attorneys and public defenders. (FE)
Title
Index of discovery for district attorneys and public defenders. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. Bob Donovan [R] |
Rep. Joy Goeben [R] | Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Introduced |