WI SB419 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-18-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-18-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 980.08 (4) (dm) 1. (intro.), 980.08 (4) (dm) 2. and 980.08 (6m) of the statutes; Relating to: notification to tribal chairs and tribal law enforcement agencies for a sexually violent person being placed on supervised release in a county in which the tribe is located.
Title
Notification to tribal chairs and tribal law enforcement agencies for a sexually violent person being placed on supervised release in a county in which the tribe is located.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Published 3-18-2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-17-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 190 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Introduced |