WI SB371 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 1.10 (4); and to create 1.10 (3) (w) of the statutes; Relating to: designating Colby as the state cheese.
Title
Designating Colby as the state cheese.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |