WI SB314 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.932, 175.36 and 946.77 of the statutes; Relating to: restrictions on enforcing federal laws regulating firearms, firearm accessories, and ammunition, the use of public resources to confiscate firearms, and providing a penalty.
Title
Restrictions on enforcing federal laws regulating firearms, firearm accessories, and ammunition, the use of public resources to confiscate firearms, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Representative Born added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduced |