WI SB230 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.484 of the statutes; Relating to: providing an exemption from civil liability for forcibly entering a vehicle under certain circumstances.
Title
Providing an exemption from civil liability for forcibly entering a vehicle under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-02 | Senate | Representative Genrich added as a cosponsor |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2015-09-14 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wirch |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb230 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB230.pdf |