WI SB218 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 71.07 (5d) (c) 1.; to amend 1.12 (1) (b), 13.172 (1), 13.48 (13) (a), 13.62 (2), 13.94 (4) (a) 1., 13.95 (intro.), 16.002 (2), 16.004 (4), 16.004 (5), 16.004 (12) (a), 16.045 (1) (a), 16.15 (1) (ab), 16.41 (4), 16.417 (1) (b), 16.52 (7), 16.528 (1) (a), 16.53 (2), 16.54 (9) (a) 1., 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 16.765 (5), 16.765 (6), 16.765 (7) (intro.), 16.765 (7) (d), 16.765 (8), 16.85 (2), 16.865 (8), 25.14 (1) (a) (intro.), 73.03 (63), 77.54 (9a) (a), 100.45 (1) (dm) and 230.03 (3); to repeal and recreate 230.03 (3); and to create 13.94 (1) (dx), 13.94 (1s) (c) 9., 16.015, 16.5195, 19.42 (10) (t), 19.42 (13) (p), 20.195, 25.90, 40.02 (54) (n), 70.11 (38v) and chapter 239 of the statutes; Relating to: the angel investment tax credit, creation of the Wisconsin Venture Capital Authority, creation of the Wisconsin forward jobs fund to be administered by that authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
The angel investment tax credit, creation of the Wisconsin Venture Capital Authority, creation of the Wisconsin forward jobs fund to be administered by that authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Local Government |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb218 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB218.pdf |