WI SB199 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-18-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-18-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 940.225 (2) (k) and 940.225 (5) (aj) of the statutes; Relating to: sexual contact by a law enforcement officer with a person in detainment or custody and providing a penalty.
Title
Sexual contact by a law enforcement officer with a person in detainment or custody and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Published 3-18-2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-17-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 188 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-01-24 | House | Representatives Drake and Emerson added as cosponsors |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-17 | House | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |