WI SB184 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on February 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Published 2-18-2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on February 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Published 2-18-2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.08 (1m) (b); and to create 15.405 (7e), 440.08 (2) (a) 39m., 440.08 (2) (a) 64g., 448.695 (3) and chapter 462 of the statutes; relating to: licenses and limited X-ray machine operator permits to engage in the practice of radiography, creating a radiography examining board, granting rule-making authority, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Title
Licenses and limited X-ray machine operator permits to engage in the practice of radiography, creating a radiography examining board, granting rule-making authority, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Published 2-18-2010. | |
2010-02-05 | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 106 | |
2010-02-02 | Presented to the Governor on 2-2-2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Report correctly enrolled on 1-22-2010 | |
2010-01-19 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-01-19 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-19 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 85, Noes 11 | |
2010-01-19 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-19 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-19 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-13 | Placed on calendar 1-19-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2009-11-10 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-11-10 | Received from Senate | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 2 | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-05 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-05 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | |
2009-11-04 | Placed on calendar 11-5-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-29 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-29 | Report passage recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 1 | |
2009-10-28 | Executive action taken | |
2009-10-22 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2009-09-23 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-09-23 | Report passage recommended by committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-17 | Executive action taken | |
2009-08-18 | Public hearing held | |
2009-05-22 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-05-22 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2009-05-04 | Introduced |