WI SB177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 121.15 (1) (a) 1. and 121.15 (1) (a) 2. to 5.; to renumber 121.15 (1) (a) 6.; to renumber and amend 121.15 (1) (a); and to create 121.15 (1) (a) 2. to 6. of the statutes; Relating to: the timing of equalization aid payments to school districts. (FE)
Title
The timing of equalization aid payments to school districts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |