WI SB157 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (b) 22. of the statutes; Relating to: changing the individual income tax deduction eligibility requirements for certain adoption-related expenses. (FE)
Title
Changing the individual income tax deduction eligibility requirements for certain adoption-related expenses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Representative Pronschinske added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Representative Ballweg added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb157 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB157.pdf |