WI SB140 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.566 (1) (hp), 49.45 (5m) (am), 49.45 (6m) (ag) (intro.), 49.45 (6y) (a), 49.45 (6z) (a) (intro.), 49.45 (8) (b), 49.45 (24m) (intro.), 49.45 (51) (a), 49.473 (5) and 79.01 (2d); and to create 20.255 (2) (g), 20.435 (4) (ht), 71.10 (5k), 71.10 (5L), 71.10 (5n), 121.115 and 121.90 (2) (am) 5. of the statutes; relating to: creating an individual income tax checkoff for contributions to elementary and secondary education, shared revenue, and Medical Assistance, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating an individual income tax checkoff for contributions to elementary and secondary education, shared revenue, and Medical Assistance, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Terry Moulton [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] |
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Michelle Litjens [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] |
Rep. Evan Wynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-07-13 | Senate | LRB correction |
2011-07-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health, Human Services, and Revenue |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb140 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB140.pdf |