WI SB108 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 767.41 (2) (e) 1., 767.41 (2) (e) 2., 767.41 (5) (c) and 767.451 (3m); and to create chapter 324 of the statutes; Relating to: a Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act.
Title
A Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Published 3-12-2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-11-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 161 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-10-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:44 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-03-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |