WI AJR114 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commemorating the 100th anniversary of Marshfield Clinic and declaring Thursday, October 13, 2016, as Marshfield Clinic Day in Wisconsin.
Title
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of Marshfield Clinic and declaring Thursday, October 13, 2016, as Marshfield Clinic Day in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Concurred in |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-16 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced |