WI AB804 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Published 3-31-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 196.372, 196.975, 285.41 (3) and 285.45 (3); to renumber 182.0175 (1) (bt); to renumber and amend 30.025 (4), 182.0175 (3) (a) (title), 182.0175 (3) (a) and 182.0175 (3) (b); to amend 20.155 (1) (g), 30.206 (1) (ag) 2., 30.208 (3) (e), 66.0821 (5) (a), 66.0821 (5) (e) (intro.), 66.0821 (5) (e) 2., 66.0821 (5) (e) 3., 66.0821 (5) (e) 4., 182.0175 (2) (am) (title), 182.0175 (2) (am) 7., 182.0175 (2) (bm) (title), 182.0175 (4), 182.0175 (5), 196.374 (3) (b) 2., 196.52 (3) (d) 2., 200.59 (5) (d), 285.41 (4) (a), 285.41 (4) (a) 4., 285.41 (4) (c) and 285.41 (4) (d); to repeal and recreate 182.0175 (3) (title); and to create 30.025 (4) (c), 66.0821 (5) (f), 182.0175 (1) (ab), 182.0175 (1) (ac), 182.0175 (1) (ad), 182.0175 (1) (ag), 182.0175 (1) (bq), 182.0175 (1) (br), 182.0175 (1) (bx), 182.0175 (1m) (d) 8. to 12., 182.0175 (3) (am), 182.0175 (3) (c), 182.0175 (3) (d) 2., 182.0175 (3) (e), 182.0175 (3) (f), 182.0175 (3) (g), 196.85 (1m) (e) and 196.85 (1m) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: one-call system violations; sulfur dioxide compliance plans; assessment authority of the Public Service Commission; funding for statewide energy efficiency and renewable resource programs; public utility contracts with affiliated interests; local access and transport areas for telephone service; railroad telecommunications service; Department of Natural Resources permit application procedures related to the construction of a high-voltage transmission line; navigable water general permits and individual permits related to utility facilities; granting rule-making authority; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
One-call system violations; sulfur dioxide compliance plans; assessment authority of the Public Service Commission; funding for statewide energy efficiency and renewable resource programs; public utility contracts with affiliated interests; local access and transport areas for telephone service; railroad telecommunications service; Department of Natural Resources permit application procedures related to the construction of a high-voltage transmission line; navigable water general permits and individual permits related to utility facilities; granting rule-making authority; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] | Rep. John Macco [R] | Rep. Warren Petryk [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Roger Roth [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Published 3-31-2016 |
2016-03-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-30-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 299 |
2016-03-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-29-2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | LRB correction |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Miller, Risser, Vinehout, Carpenter, Harris Dodd, Ringhand, C. Larson, Wirch, Hansen, Shilling and Bewley |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Miller, Risser, Vinehout, Carpenter, Harris Dodd, Ringhand, C. Larson, Wirch, Hansen, Lassa, Shilling, Erpenbach and Bewley |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 33, Paired 2 |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 33 |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 offered by Representatives C. Taylor and Mason |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 withdrawn and returned to author |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:56 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Kuglitsch |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2016-02-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2016-02-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2016-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Kuglitsch |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kuglitsch |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Zepnick, Kahl, Sargent, Genrich and Stuck |
2016-02-09 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Energy and Utilities and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2016-02-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-02-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced |