WI AB701 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.45 (19) (a), 49.45 (19) (c), 767.804 (3) (d) 1., 767.805 (4) (d) 1. and 767.89 (3) (e) 1.; and to create 49.22 (9m) of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating recovery by the state for birth expenses paid through the Medical Assistance program. (FE)
Title
Eliminating recovery by the state for birth expenses paid through the Medical Assistance program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2021-11-12 | House | Introduced |