WI AB67 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 344.62 (2), 344.64, 344.65 (1) (b) and 344.65 (2); to renumber and amend 344.25 and 344.65 (1) (a); to amend 165.755 (1) (b), 302.46 (1) (a), 344.25 (title), 344.26 (1) (a), 344.26 (1) (b) (intro.), 344.26 (1) (b) 1., 344.62 (1), 344.65 (1) (c), 757.05 (1) (a), 814.63 (1) (c), 814.63 (2), 814.65 (1), 814.85 (1) (a) and 814.86 (1); to repeal and recreate 344.26 (title); and to create 343.21 (1) (jg), 344.25 (2m), 344.26 (1) (am), 344.65 (1) (a) 2., 344.65 (1) (a) 3. and 344.65 (1) (a) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: penalties for violations related to the motor vehicle liability insurance requirement, proof of financial responsibility, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Penalties for violations related to the motor vehicle liability insurance requirement, proof of financial responsibility, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-07 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2017-03-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab67 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB67.pdf |