WI AB656 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 100.197 of the statutes; Relating to: notifications concerning the assertion of rights under a patent or pending patent and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Notifications concerning the assertion of rights under a patent or pending patent and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Neylon [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] |
Rep. Peter Barca [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Sen. Paul Farrow [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Bob Jauch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining, Ayes 15, Noes 1 |
2014-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Neylon |
2014-02-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Kooyenga added as a coauthor |
2014-02-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neylon |
2014-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining |
2014-01-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab656 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB656.pdf |