WI AB649 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.091 (1), 29.161 (2), 29.164 (2) (b), 29.173 (2) (a), 29.182 (3) (a), 29.182 (3) (b), 29.184 (3) (c), 29.185 (6) (a) 1., 29.185 (6) (b), 29.193 (2) (d), 29.204 (2), 29.207 (2), 29.211 (2), 29.213 (2), 29.304 (title), 29.304 (1) (a), 29.304 (1) (b), 29.304 (2) (b) (intro.), 29.304 (2) (b) 2., 29.304 (3) (b) (intro.), 29.304 (3) (b) 2., 29.304 (5) (a), 29.304 (5) (b) 2., 29.312 (2), 29.314 (3) (a), 29.314 (3) (b) 4., 29.314 (4) (a), 29.324 (1) (b), 29.324 (1) (c), 29.592 (1) (intro.), 29.592 (3) and 29.621 (4) (intro.); and to create 29.001 (5), 29.001 (41s) and 29.014 (1s) of the statutes; Relating to: hunting with a high-powered air rifle or an airbow and providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Hunting with a high-powered air rifle or an airbow and providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2018-01-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2018-01-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry |
2017-11-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab649 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB649.pdf |