WI AB649 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 344.16 (1); to amend 344.14 (2) (d) and 344.16 (2); and to create 344.16 (1) (a) and (b), 344.16 (2m) and 344.63 (1) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: self-insurance by religious sects for purposes of motor vehicle financial responsibility and liability insurance requirements. (FE)
Title
Self-insurance by religious sects for purposes of motor vehicle financial responsibility and liability insurance requirements. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:25 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kulp |
2016-01-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab649 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB649.pdf |