WI AB641 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 13.52 of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating the Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions.
Title
Eliminating the Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive session held |
2016-01-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab641 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB641.pdf |