WI AB571 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber subchapter II (title) of chapter 616 [precedes 616.71]; and to create 600.01 (1) (b) 12., 601.31 (1) (kr), subchapter III of chapter 616 [precedes 616.50] and 628.02 (1) (b) 9. of the statutes; relating to: regulating certain service contracts and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Regulating certain service contracts and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. John Nygren [R] | Rep. Daniel LeMahieu [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-17 | House | Senator Lasee added as a cosponsor |
2012-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance |
2012-02-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab571 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB571.pdf |