WI AB546 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create chapter 461 of the statutes; Relating to: providing complementary and alternative health care practitioners with exemptions from practice protection laws, requirements and prohibitions for individuals who provide complementary and alternative health care services, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Providing complementary and alternative health care practitioners with exemptions from practice protection laws, requirements and prohibitions for individuals who provide complementary and alternative health care services, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2020-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2020-02-20 | House | Point of order that Assembly Amendment 3 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Anderson, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, L. Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor and Zamarripa |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:16 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 6 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 6 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Felzkowski |
2020-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Felzkowski |
2020-01-22 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2020-01-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-07 | House | Representative Thiesfeldt added as a coauthor |
2019-10-31 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2019-10-31 | House | Senator Bernier added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-30 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-10-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-10-14 | House | Introduced |