WI AB525 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 70.11 (46) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a property tax exemption for a nonprofit youth baseball association. (FE)
Title
Creating a property tax exemption for a nonprofit youth baseball association. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Report Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions |
2014-02-17 | House | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2014-02-06 | House | Executive action taken by committee on Ways and Means |
2014-01-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kuglitsch and Sinicki |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing held by committee on Ways and Means |
2013-12-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions |
2013-11-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-11-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab525 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB525.pdf |