WI AB465 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 165.87 (1) (a), 165.87 (1) (e), 165.87 (1m) and 165.87 (4); to amend 165.87 (title), 165.87 (1) (intro.), 165.87 (1) (b), 165.87 (1) (c), 165.87 (1) (d), 165.87 (2) (a), 165.87 (2) (b) (intro.), 165.87 (2) (d), 165.87 (2) (e), 165.87 (3) (a) 2. (intro.), 165.87 (3) (b), 165.87 (3) (c) 1., 165.87 (3) (c) 2., 165.87 (3) (d) and 165.87 (3) (e); and to create 111.70 (4) (mc) 7., 111.91 (2) (t), 165.85 (4) (em), 165.87 (1) (dm), 165.87 (1m) and 165.87 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring the use of body cameras by law enforcement and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Requiring the use of body cameras by law enforcement and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Representative Milroy added as a coauthor |
2021-09-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-07-12 | House | Introduced |