WI AB458 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (1) (gd) and 255.20 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: violence prevention grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Violence prevention grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-09-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-15 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2021-07-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-07-12 | House | Introduced |