WI AB447 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 138.09 (8) (f) and 138.14 of the statutes; relating to: payday loan providers, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Title
Payday loan providers, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-18 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Biotechnology, and Financial Institutions | |
2010-02-17 | Printed engrossed by the direction of the Senate Chief Clerk | |
2010-02-17 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-16 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 38 | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Refused to table Assembly substitute amendment 1, Ayes 43, Noes 54 | |
2010-02-16 | Point of order that Assembly substitute amendment 1 not germane not well taken | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 5 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 41 | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 5 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Gottlieb, Newcomer and Huebsch | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 4 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 72, Noes 24 | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 4 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Richards | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 3 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 41 | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 3 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Bernard Schaber, Pasch, Danou, Clark, Zigmunt, Roys, Mason, Milroy, Hubler, Schneider, Vruwink, Turner, Steinbrink, Hixson, Kessler, Benedict, Grigsby, A. Williams, Pocan, Black, Hilgenberg and Berceau | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Fields, Smith, Zepnick, Seidel, Hintz and Jorgensen | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author | |
2010-02-16 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Davis | |
2010-02-16 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-16 | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 2-16-2010 | |
2010-02-10 | LRB correction (Assembly substitute amendment 1) | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on calendar 2-16-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-10 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 6, Noes 5 | |
2010-02-10 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 6, Noes 5 | |
2010-02-10 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-09 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Fields, Hintz, Jorgensen, Seidel, Smith and Zepnick | |
2010-02-05 | Senator Taylor added as a cosponsor | |
2009-10-07 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-06 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-09-25 | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions | |
2009-09-25 | Introduced |