WI AB411 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.57 (title) and 119.04 (1); and to create 118.018, 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. m., 118.40 (2r) (d) 3., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. m., 118.40 (2x) (d) 3. and 118.57 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: anti-racism and anti-sexism pupil instruction and anti-racism and anti-sexism training for employees of school districts and independent charter schools. (FE)
Title
Anti-racism and anti-sexism pupil instruction and anti-racism and anti-sexism training for employees of school districts and independent charter schools. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-02-04 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 2-4-2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-1-2022 |
2022-01-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-27-2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Smith, Agard, Erpenbach, L. Taylor, Wirch, Carpenter, Ringhand, Bewley, Roys, Larson and Johnson |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 38 |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a second time |
2021-09-23 | House | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-09-23 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-23 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2021-09-23 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-09-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wichgers |
2021-08-12 | House | Representative Cabral-Guevara added as a coauthor |
2021-08-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-09 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-06-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-06-25 | House | Introduced |