WI AB324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.962 (1) (a), 440.962 (1) (b), 440.962 (1) (c), 440.962 (1) (d) and 440.964; to renumber 440.96 (2); to renumber and amend 440.96 (1); to amend 440.965; and to create 440.96 (1g), 440.96 (2m), 440.96 (3), 440.962 (1) (am), 440.968 (1) (e), 440.9693 and 440.9696 of the statutes; Relating to: registration and the scope of practice of interior designers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Registration and the scope of practice of interior designers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-12 | House | Representative Rohrkaste withdrawn as a coauthor |
2020-01-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Horlacher and Stubbs |
2019-07-30 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-07-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab324 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB324.pdf |