WI AB266 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 36.31 (1); and to amend 36.31 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating certain restrictions on the respective educational roles of the University of Wisconsin System and the Technical College System. (FE)
Title
Eliminating certain restrictions on the respective educational roles of the University of Wisconsin System and the Technical College System. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2021-06-22 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2021-06-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-01 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Shankland, Hesselbein, Anderson, Emerson and Stubbs |
2021-05-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2021-04-16 | House | Introduced |