WI AB257 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 254.18; to amend 254.18 (title); and to create 254.18 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: exemption from lead inspection requirements for sampling or testing during certain lead-safe renovations. (FE)
Title
Exemption from lead inspection requirements for sampling or testing during certain lead-safe renovations. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Sen. Mary Lazich [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-26 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kuglitsch |
2015-06-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2015-06-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab257 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB257.pdf |