WI AB236 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Published 2-25-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Published 2-25-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.33 (1) (am) of the statutes; relating to: requiring that certain high school agriculture courses be counted as science credits.
Title
Requiring that certain high school agriculture courses be counted as science credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Published 2-25-2010 | |
2010-02-11 | Report approved by the Governor on 2-11-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 114 | |
2010-02-09 | Presented to the Governor on 2-9-2010 | |
2010-02-01 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-01-28 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-01-28 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-28 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-01-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-28 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-28 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Kapanke added as a cosponsor | |
2010-01-27 | Placed on calendar 1-28-2010 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-12-21 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-12-21 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-15 | Executive action taken | |
2009-12-03 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2009-09-17 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-09-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-16 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-09-16 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-16 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-09-16 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-10 | Placed on calendar 9-16-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-06-23 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-06-23 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Agriculture, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2009-06-23 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Agriculture, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | |
2009-05-28 | Executive action taken | |
2009-05-26 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Radcliffe | |
2009-05-14 | Public hearing held | |
2009-05-13 | Representative Mursau added as a coauthor | |
2009-04-30 | Withdrawn from committee on Education and referred to committee on Agriculture | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2009-04-29 | Introduced |