WI AB220 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 941.29 (2); to renumber and amend 941.29 (1); to amend 175.60 (11) (a) 2. f., 813.12 (2) (c) 1., 813.122 (2) (b) 1., 813.123 (5) (a) 2. a., 813.125 (4) (a) 2. a., 941.29 (3), 941.29 (4), 941.29 (5) (intro.), 941.29 (5) (a), 941.29 (8), 941.29 (9), 941.29 (10) (intro.) and 973.176 (1); and to create 941.29 (1g), 941.29 (4m) and 973.123 of the statutes; Relating to: establishing a mandatory minimum period of confinement in prison for a person who possesses a firearm or who uses a firearm to commit certain crimes after being convicted of committing certain violent felonies, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Establishing a mandatory minimum period of confinement in prison for a person who possesses a firearm or who uses a firearm to commit certain crimes after being convicted of committing certain violent felonies, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-06 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-11 | House | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 109 |
2015-11-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-10 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-10 | House | LRB correction |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 23, Noes 9 |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Senator Darling added as a cosponsor |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Representatives Sargent, Rohrkaste, Tittl, Jacque, Schraa, Skowronski, Spiros, Petersen, J. Ott, Thiesfeldt, E. Brooks, Kuglitsch, Jorgensen, Barca and Kolste added as coauthors |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Bowen and Jarchow |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a second time |
2015-06-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-03 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2015-06-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-06-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Bowen |
2015-06-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bowen |
2015-05-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2015-05-18 | House | Introduced |